Braaksma v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Diana Braaksma
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00048
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss, & Defendant's Response to that Order reflecting it had lost $2,011.00 in costs & fees, the Court directs that if Plaintiffs refile this case - in any state or federal court - they must pay $2, 011.00 to the Defendant within 30 days of any refiling. If Plaintiffs do not pay this amount within the time provided, the Defendant may move the Court to reduce this Order to judgment forthwith & collect the certified amount from the Plaintiffs, including postjudgment interest & other relief the Court may properly award. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/5/2010. (jct)
September 13, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without prejudice on a condition 31 Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Because the case has proceeded so far, the dismissal is conditioned upon Plaintiffs paying Defendant (w/i 30 days of any refiling) any Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) costs & attorney's fees incurred in this case that will be sunk & lost by the nonsuit. Most of Defendant's costs & attorney's fees, of course, will not be lost - the answer, the mutual discovery & the motion papers ca n all be recycled if Plaintiffs refile. The parties should confer & try to stipulate to Defendant's lost costs & attorney's fees. If they cannot agree by 9/30/10, then Defendant should certify & file a list of what it believes to be its reasonable lost costs & fees. Plaintiffs should respond as soon as possible. The court will enter a further Order after considering the details. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2010. (jct)
October 2, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Compel; Pltfs are directed to provide the ordered responses, on or before October 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/2/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braaksma v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Braaksma
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Lunde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?