Lackey v. Clarkedale Arkansas, City Of et al

Plaintiff: Gregory M Lackey
Defendant: Clarkedale Arkansas, City Of, Sam Stuckey, Robert Hall, Rueben Parnell, Madelyn Keith and Dave Thomas
Case Number: 3:2009cv00062
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to administratively terminate this action, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings for good cause shown, for the entry of any stipulation or order, or for any other purpose required to obtain a final determination of the litigation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/15/2012. (jak)
October 16, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Pursuant to Order entered in 3:08CV00061 SWW remanding that action back to Crittenden County Circuit Court, this case is STAYED pursuant to Younger v. Harris, 91 S.Ct. 746(1971). The parties are directed to file a status report in this case within five days of the resolution of the state case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/16/09. (jct)
July 21, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Consolidate Cases 3:09CV00061-SWW & 3:09CV00062-JLH, to continue as a single case under the lead case, Case No. 3:09CV00061-SWW. The parties are advised that all filings should be made only in the lead case, & the Clerk is directed that this Order should be filed in both cases. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/21/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey v. Clarkedale Arkansas, City Of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M Lackey
Represented By: James C. Hale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarkedale Arkansas, City Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rueben Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madelyn Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?