Weatherford v. Arkansas State University

Plaintiff: Evelyne S Weatherford
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Case Number: 3:2009cv00071
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 37 Order entered this date, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/2/09. (jct)
August 26, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Plaintiff of her responsibility to be familiar & comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of the Court. Plaintiff is advised of her right to respond to Defendant's pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/26/09. (jct)
August 13, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 & 16 Defendant's Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/13/09. (jct)
July 17, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue summons against deft Arkansas State University and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and a copy of the complaint personally on Dr. Les Wyatt. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/17/09. (bkp)
June 24, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue summons against Defendant Arkansas State University, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons & a copy of the Complaint personally on Dr. Les Wyatt or a designated agent of the Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/24/09. (jct)
May 19, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER provisionally approving 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed at the Direction of the Court by Jean Turman on 5/19/09. (jct) Modified on 5/19/2009 to reflect that copy was handed to Plaintiff w/copy of ifp application & Complaint (jct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherford v. Arkansas State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyne S Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?