Sexton et al v. Dotson et al

Plaintiff: Ernest B Sexton, Jr and Joann Sexton
Defendant: Jody Dotson, Dan Ellison and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 3:2009cv00080
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 90 Order entered this date, the Sextons' complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2011. (jct)
April 19, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing ( Status Report due by 7/16/2010 ) on pending criminal charages against JoAnn Sexton. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/2010. (jct)
February 16, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Pending Criminal Charges. The 5/17/10 jury trial is removed from the Court's docket & will be re-set by subsequent Order. The Clerk is directed to hold this case in abeyance pending further notice from the Court. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on the pending criminal charges on, or before, 4/16/10. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/2010. (jct)
October 16, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Voluntary Non-Suit. Plaintiffs' complaint against the Lawrence County Sheriff's Department is dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal renders 28 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lawrence County Sheriff's Department moot & it is dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/16/09. (jct)
October 15, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Separate Defendant the State of Arkansas. Plaintiffs' complaint against the State of Arkansas is dismissed without prejudice. The Court dismisses as moot 25 State of Arkansas's Motion to Dismiss. There remains pending separate Defendant Lawrence County Sheriff's Department 28 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are instructed to respond on, or before, 10/23/09. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/09. (jct)
September 28, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arkansas, State of, directing Plaintiff's appointed counsel to file a response on or before 10/23/09. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/28/09. (jct)
September 21, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 William Jennings Stanley's MOTION for Relief from appointment on Plaintiffs' behalf. Mr. Joseph Franklin Kolb is APPOINTED to represent Plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/21/09. (jct)
August 31, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arkansas, State of, 28 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Lawrence County Sheriff's Department, directing Plaintiff's appointed counsel to file a response on or before 9/18/09. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/31/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton et al v. Dotson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest B Sexton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?