Nelson v. Dean et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Nelson
Defendant: Timothy L Dean and Arkansas State University
Case Number: 3:2009cv00093
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 12 Motion to Set Aside Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/16/2010. (jct)
July 31, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss; case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/31/09. (mkf)
July 23, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a ddl of 12:00 noon on Wednesday, July 29, 2009 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; otherwise, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/23/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Dean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Nelson
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?