Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Greene County Abstract & Title Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Greene County Abstract & Title Company LLC and Mary Williams
Case Number: 3:2009cv00102
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON GARNISHEE, re 60 Answer to Writ of Garnishment filed by Arkansas Sales Tax Specialist Inc, Garnishee, the Court finds that Plaintiff has a valid judgment against Defendant, Mary Williams; Defendant Mary Williams has filed no objection to t he Garnishment. IT IS THEREFORE CONSIDERED, ORDERED & ADJUDGED that Garnishee, Arkansas Sales Tax Specialist, Inc., be & hereby is ordered to forward to Plaintiff, Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, for every pay period, 25% of Defe ndant Mary Williams' net disposable wages from bi-weekly wages, until the total amount of Judgment, plus accrued interest, is extinguished or until such time Defendant Mary Williams ceases to be employed by Garnishee. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/30/2010. (jct)
April 23, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT awarding judgment, jointly and severally, against defendants Greene County Abstract & Title Company, LLC, Precision Title Services, LLC, and Mary Williams in the amount of $1,359.219.48, plus costs in the amount of $542.00, plus attorneys' fees in the amount of $95,189.99, plus interest at the rate of 5% per annum from the date of entry until paid. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/23/10. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 10 ; granting 46 Joint MOTION to Amend 10 Preliminary Injunction. It is therefore ordered that the Preliminary Injunction is hereby modified to permit the Defendant, Greene County Abstract & Title Company, LLC., to sell the assets named herein to Clay County Abstract & Title Insurance, Inc. & upon such sale to pay the sale proceeds to Planters & Merchants Bank of Gillett, Arkansas. The officers & members of Greene County Abstract & Title Company, LLC. are hereby permitted to execute, acknowledge & endorse all documents to effect such transfer. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/12/09. (jct)
September 8, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to conduct expedited depositions; denying as moot 22 & 23 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/8/09. (jct)
July 24, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/24/09. (mkf)
July 17, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/17/09. (bkp)
July 10, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER directing National Title to submit an injunction bond in the amount of $5,000.00 before the TRO is effective; setting a hearing for the motion for preliminary injunction for July 20, 2009, at 1:00 p.m. in Little Rock, Courtroom 2D; and ordering National Title to serve this TRO on Greene County Abstract and Williams as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/10/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Greene County Abstract & Title Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: William Dean Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Abstract & Title Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?