Parker v. Pilot Truck Stop Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Joel Kenneth Parker
Defendant: Pilot Truck Stop Corporation, West Memphis Arkansas, City of, West Memphis Police Department, William H Johnson, Robert Paudert, Mike Allen, Oakes, Mark McDougal, Eddie West, Sanders, Johnny Moore, Will Smith, Shelton, Brandon Hatley, Richard Dennis, James Moore, James Wilson, E Williams, R Hester, Barbara Robertson and Janet Parker
Case Number: 3:2009cv00113
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 89 Order entered this date, Joel Kenneth Parker's claims under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 are dismissed with prejudice. His claims arising under the laws of the State of Arkansas are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/26/2010. (jct)
June 23, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The time within which Plaintiff must submit his objections is extended up to & including 7/23/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/23/2010. (jct)
March 17, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 1/6/10 Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/2010. (jct)
February 22, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to correctly identify Defendant Billy Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/2010. (jct)
January 12, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue Summons for Defendants Brian Shelton, Brandon Hatley, Richard Dennis, Mark McDougal, Will Smith & Sanders. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Summons, Complaint & Amended Complaint on Defendants at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with the correct names of Defendants Officer James Moore & Officer E. Wilson within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of these Defendants from Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/12/2010. (jct)
January 6, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. in their entirety as this Court's findings. IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED that Defendants Pilot Travel Centers LLC.; Pilot Truck Stop; Barbara Robertson; West Memphis Arkansas, City of; West Memphis Police Department; William H. Johnson and Janet Parker are DISMISSED from Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/2010. (jct)
December 7, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 15 Plaintiff's Response to 12 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting him an extension of time up to & including 1/4/2010 in which to file an additional response. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/09. (jct)
November 19, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defendants Robert Paudert, Mike Allen, Captain Oakes, Mark McDougal, Eddie West, Inspector Sanders, Johnny Moore, Will Smith, Sgt. Shelton, Brandon Hatley, Richard Dennis, James Moore, James Wilson, Of ficer E. Williams, and Officer R. Hester; and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the original (DE#2) and amended complaints (DE#11) and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Pilot Truck Stop Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Kenneth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Truck Stop Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McDougal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?