Ashley v. J and S Blair Properties LLC

Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Defendant: J and S Blair Properties LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00159
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Except as set forth in the settlement agreement, all parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees & costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/3/2010. (jct)
June 8, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Defendant's MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery & extend motions deadline. (Discovery due by 7/15/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2010). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/8/2010. (jct)
February 10, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for insufficient service of process. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. J and S Blair Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and S Blair Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?