Salazar v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Robert Salazar
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2009cv00162
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney's Fees & Expenses. Plaintiff is awarded $3,542.39 in fees & expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/7/2010. (jct)
August 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 17 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, the Commissioner's decision is reversed & this action is remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/4/2010. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
January 12, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 MOTION to Extend Time to file brief. Plaintiff's brief deadline is extended up to & including 2/12/2010. Defendant's brief shall be due 42 days from the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/12/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Salazar
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?