Sanders v. Roane et al

Plaintiff: Rosie Sanders
Defendant: Phillip Roane, Benjamin Mellen and G&H Transportation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00164
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER Of Dismissal dismissing only separate defendant, Benjamin Mellen, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/17/2011. (jct)
August 10, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Defendant's Motion for Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/10/2011. (jct)
August 3, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/3/2011. (jct)
August 2, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Jury Verdict, re 29 Jury Verdict, that the plaintiff, Rosie Sanders, take nothing on her Complaint against the Defendant, Phillip Roane, & the Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/2/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Roane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Sanders
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Roane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Mellen
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&H Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?