Paragould Arkansas, City of v. Watkins et al

Counter Defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of
Counter Claimant: Connie Burns Watkins and Richard Watkins
ThirdParty Defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of, Mike Gaskill, J D Stephenson, Todd Stovall, Monty Martin, Mike Tinnin, Jaree Johnson, Phillip Faulkner, Dennis Dunn, Randy Philhours, Kimberly Dale, Allen Warmath, Paragould Light & Water Commission, Bill Fisher, Darrell Phillips, William McCartney, Frank Curtis, John White, Larry Bobbit, Daniel Wilkerson, Don Wallace, Crafton Tree Service, Frank Crafton, Jake Crafton and Bradley P Hancock
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Connie Burns Watkins and Richard Watkins
Case Number: 3:2009cv00172
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Reconsider. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion is DENIED as MOOT, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to no longer accept filings from Defendants in this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 09/06/2012. (jak)
August 23, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Reopen Case and Notice of Removal of Newly Alleged Federal Claims; denying as moot 66 Motion to Clarify; denying as moot 67 Motion for Recusal or Disqualification of Judge Billy Roy Wilson Jr.; denying as moot 72 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/23/2012. (jak)
November 24, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Judgment Based on Fraud & 39 Motion for Order to Amend Findings, etc. The request that the Court clarify who is appellant & appellee is DENIED AS MOOT, because the Orde r remanding this case is not reviewable on appeal. Since this case was remanded to the Circuit Court of Greene County, Arkansas, Civil Division, on October 26, 2009, the Clerk of the Court is directed to no longer accept filings from Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs in this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/24/09. (jct)
October 26, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, based on findings of fact & conclusions of law, GRANTING 5 Motion to Strike Fifth Amended Counterclaim & 6 Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint w/ Defendants' Fifth Amended Counterclaim & Cross-Complaint being STRUCK; DENYING 15 Motion to Remand, or, in the Alternative to have all claims removed to Federal Court. All remaining Motions: 10 MOTION to Extend Time; 11 MOTION to Dismiss; 14 MOTION to Strike; 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct; 24 MOTION for Leave to File & 25 MOTIO N for Reconsideration are DENIED AS MOOT. Because diversity is lacking and the Court now lacks federal question jurisdiction, this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Greene County, Arkansas, Civil Division. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/26/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paragould Arkansas, City of v. Watkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Connie Burns Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Mike Gaskill
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: J D Stephenson
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Todd Stovall
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Monty Martin
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Mike Tinnin
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Jaree Johnson
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Phillip Faulkner
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Dennis Dunn
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Randy Philhours
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Kimberly Dale
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Allen Warmath
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Paragould Light & Water Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Bill Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Darrell Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: William McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Frank Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: John White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Larry Bobbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Daniel Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Don Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Crafton Tree Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Frank Crafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Jake Crafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Bradley P Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Connie Burns Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?