Weast v. Family Dollar Distribution Center

Plaintiff: Brock Weast
Defendant: Family Dollar Distribution Center
Case Number: 3:2009cv00196
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/15/2011. (jct)
July 6, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Rozier & Barnum. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants David Barnum and Delrick Rozier is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/6/2010. (jct)
June 4, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the dismissal of Anita Brown-Wilson & Yvonne Carr; denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of summons. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/4/2010. (jct)
May 12, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's allegations of Constitutional claims against all parties & the discrimination claims against Defendants Brown-Wilson & Carr are hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/12/2010. (jct)
March 11, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order striking from the record letters attached to Plaintiff's complaint which included offers of settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/11/2010. (jct)
March 2, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Family Dollar Services Inc.'s MOTION to Strike Portions of 20 Amended Complaint. For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED that page 21, the 11/18/09 letter from Family Dollar to Plaintiff, & page 22 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's 11/20/09 response, shall be removed from the Amended Complaint & stricken from the record. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/2010. (jct)
February 18, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 20 Amended Complaint, directing the Clerk to issue the summons as to Plaintiff's claims. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint & Summons on the new parties without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/18/2010. (jct)
February 2, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate the correct name of the Defendant as Family Dollar Services, Inc. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/2/2010. (jct)
November 10, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER provisionally granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brock Weast. Signed by J Turman at the Direction of the Court on 11/10/09. (jct) (copy handed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weast v. Family Dollar Distribution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Weast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Distribution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?