Smith v. Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc

Plaintiff: Verlin Smith
Defendant: Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00203
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This Order replaces, nunc pro tunc, 22 Order filed 7/7/11, correcting an omission from a footnote. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/14/2011. (jct)
July 7, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc per 22 Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/7/2011. (jct)
May 9, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Dispositive Motions filed by Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc. Accordingly, dispositive motions will be due by 5:00 p.m., Friday, May 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/9/2011. (jct)
April 15, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential documents in this cause of action. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/15/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlin Smith
Represented By: Marc I. Baretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?