Scott v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Defendant: Dick Busby, Zane Boyd and Teresa Bonner
Case Number: 3:2010cv00007
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Defendants' MOTION to Continue Pre-Jury Evidentiary Hearing and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. The 5/16/11 hearing is cancelled & the Transportation Order 50 is hereby CANCELLED. Defendants shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment w/i 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/10/2011. (jct)
March 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. in their entirety. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Crittenden County Detention Facility is hereby dismissed from Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/8/2010. (jct)
February 19, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 2 Complaint & 5 First Amended Complaint, directing the Clerk to prepare Summons for Defendants Busby, Boyd, Bonner & Long, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve said Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/19/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?