Bolton v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Aaron L Bolton
Defendant: Larry Mills, Paulett Arnold, Andy Allison, Dane Benett and Gary Heifner
Case Number: 3:2010cv00011
Filed: January 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 20 Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/21/2010. (jct)
April 28, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address & his intent to continue prosecution with this action w/i 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/28/2010. (jct)
April 2, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons for Defendant Ben Barret & the U.S. Marshal is to serve Defendant Barret with 2 Complaint & 5 Amended Complaint. Defendants Dane Benett, Gary Heifner, Ron Hunter, Ron Martin, Larry Mills, Andy Allison & Paulett Arnold are DISMISSED from Plaintiff's Complaint because Plaintiff failed to state a claim against them. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/2/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron L Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulett Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Heifner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?