Hart v. Beasley et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Hart
Defendant: Sharon Beasley, Camile Miller, Walter Williams, Hank Brown, Clifton Ingram, Timothy Brown, Deon Walker, John Jefferson and Antwain Ooshie
Case Number: 3:2010cv00015
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 62 Order entered this date, in favor of Jerry Hart against Sharon Beasley. Mr. Hart is awarded $3.00 in nominal damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/21/2011. (jct)
January 6, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Beasley. Plaintiff's claims for compensatory damages against Defendant Beasley for violation of his constitutional rights are DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties may respond to the Court's consideration of summary judgment for Plaintiff on his procedural due process claim w/i 14 days of entry of this Order. The 1/18/11 bench trial is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/6/2011. (jct)
November 30, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Beasley, advising Plaintiff that he may file a response within 14 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff files a response, he must also file a separate, short & concise statement setting out the facts which he thinks need to be decided at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/30/2010. (jct)
November 17, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions. ( Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/17/2010. (jct)
March 31, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, in light of 30 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the evidentiary hearing scheduled will be conducted as a bench trial. ( Bench Trial set for 1/18/2011 at 10:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere). All deadlines in 24 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/31/2010. (jct)
March 17, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order dismissing Defendants Camile Miller, Walter Williams, Hank Brown, Clifton Ingram, Timothy Brown, Deon Walker, John Jefferson & Antwain Ooshie. Whether these persons will be needed as Plaintiff's witnesses will be addressed at a later date, should an evidentiary hearing in this case be needed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/2010. (jct)
March 9, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in their entirety. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Clifton Ingram; John Jefferson; Camile Miller; Antwain Ooshie; Deon Walker; Walter Williams; Hank Brown & Timothy Brown are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/2010. (jct)
February 17, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a Summons for Defendant Sharon Beasley, & directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the 2 Complaint & 7 Amended Complaint upon Defendant Beasley through the Crittenden County Detention Sheriff's Depar tment, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. The Clerk is also directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden/Director of the Crittenden County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate for Defendants Miller, Williams, H. Brown, Ingram, T. Brown, Walker, Jefferson & Ooshie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/17/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Beasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camile Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deon Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwain Ooshie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?