Quarrels v. West Memphis School District et al

Plaintiff: Palmer Quarrels
Defendant: West Memphis School District and Bill M Kessinger
Case Number: 3:2010cv00018
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice. The Court was notified on December 29, 2011 that this action had settled; yet, nothing was ever filed indicating such. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/12/2013. (jak)
February 23, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery and Motions deadlines. (Discovery due by 4/1/2011, Motions due by 4/22/2011). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/2011. (jct)
October 7, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Jury Trial rescheduled for week of 6/27/2011 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright, Discovery due by 2/28/2011, Motions due by 3/7/2011, Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/27/2011.) All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/7/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarrels v. West Memphis School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer Quarrels
Represented By: Thomas Franklin Donaldson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill M Kessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?