Nixon v. McCann et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Defendant: Jack McCann, John Smith, Doe, Stallings, Gurthie, French and Hall
Case Number: 3:2010cv00031
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 29 Order entered this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court further certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken the Order & Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous & not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/24/2010. (jct)
March 30, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order, with failure to do so to result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/30/2010. (jct)
March 15, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to forward an IFP application to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit, no later than 30 days after entry of this Order, either the $350 statutory filing fee, or to complete & sign the IFP application, & file it. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/15/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. McCann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurthie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?