Wright Medical Group Inc et al v. Darr et al

Plaintiff: Wright Medical Group Inc and Surgical Technologies LLC
Defendant: Kevin Darr, Charles Hall and Mark Starring & Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00033
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court having been notified by counsel that a settlement has been reached in these matters, hereby dismisses the complaints and all claims in each of these actions against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/8/10. (vjt)
October 18, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/2010. (jct)
August 6, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Darr's and Hall's 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/6/10. (vjt)
July 28, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply. It is therefore ordered that Wright Medical may file its Sur-reply to 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on or before 8/2/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2010. (jct)
July 21, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File sur-reply. Wright Medical Group's sur-reply to 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment must be filed on or before 7/28/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/2010. (jct)
June 24, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to respond filed by Wright Medical Group Inc. It is therefore, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that the time for Wright Medical to file its Response to 37 Hall's & Darr's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is extended up to & including 7/9/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/24/2010. (jct)
March 19, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/19/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Bruce McMullen & Joann Coston-Holloway to bring electronic devices into the Jonesboro Courthouse for the 3/18/10 scheduled hearing. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/2010. (jct)
March 11, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas J McGoey II as co-counsel for Mark Starring & Associates Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/11/2010. (jct)
March 9, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that (Status Reports are due by close of business on 3/15/2010) identifying exhibits they intend to introduce, the names of witnesses & estimating length of the 3/18/2010 preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright Medical Group Inc et al v. Darr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wright Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Bruce A. McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surgical Technologies LLC
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Darr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Starring & Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?