Gunn v. Langston et al

Plaintiff: Audra Gunn
Defendant: Dan Langston, Greene County Sheriff's Office and Greene County
Case Number: 3:2010cv00035
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on jury verdict in favor of Greene County against Audra Gunn, now Audra Eubanks, on the sole remaining claim of retaliation. Gunn's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/8/2012. (jak)
August 22, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Gunn may proceed against Greene County on her Title VII & ACRA retaliation claims. The rest of Gunn's claims are dismissed with prejudice. The remaining claims are reset for trial at 9:30 A.M. on February 21, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2011. (jct)
July 19, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Defendants' unopposed MOTION to Dismiss. Greene County Sheriff's Office is hereby dismissed from this cause of action. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn v. Langston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Gunn
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?