Sanders v. Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc

Plaintiff: Blanche Sanders
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00037
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 MOTION of Keith Coker to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Blanche Sanders. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/2011. (jct)
May 17, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for 1/9/2012 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. All deadlines for discovery & motions have expired. All other deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/17/2011. (jct)
October 4, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time to Complete Discovery per agreement of the parties; (Discovery is extended to & including 12/31/2010). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/4/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Sanders
Represented By: Gary L. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?