Fitzgerald v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Defendant: Dick Busby, Teressa Bonner, Schrader and Lindsey Peterson
Case Number: 3:2010cv00046
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
0 Judge: Henry L. Jones
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 68 Order entered this date, Nathaniel Fitzgerald's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/2011. (jct)
April 18, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Plaintiff's MOTION to Reassign Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/18/11. (srw)
April 15, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/15/11. (kpr)
April 7, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 35 Witness List, that Nathaniel L Fitzgerald's witness is DENIED at this time. Plaintiff should notify the Court when he is able to identify this witness by name. The Arkansas Department of Correction is directed to transport Plaintiff Fitzgerald, together with his medical file, to the Richard Sheppard Arnold U. S. Courthouse, Courtroom 2C, in Little Rock, for the April 20, 2011 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/7/2011. (jct)
July 22, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Because Nathaniel Fitzgerald's amended complaint fails to state a claim against Defendant Dick Busby, he is dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2010. (jct)
March 16, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/16/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teressa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?