Williams v. Craighead County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Cletis Wayne Williams
Defendant: Craighead County Jail, French and Taylor
Case Number: 3:2010cv00049
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 60 Order entered this date, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/15/2012. (jct)
October 3, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants, pursuant to 48 Order entered this date. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/3/2011. (jct)
July 11, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to 38 Defendants' First MOTION to Compel within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/11/2011. (jct)
March 11, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 35 Response, the Clerk is directed to correctly identify the defendants as Kyle French, Justin Taylor & Margie Sain. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/11/2011. (jct)
January 18, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reflecting the referral to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney will remain in effect for any pretrial matters. Counsel is directed to file a pleading indicating the complete names of Defendants French, Taylor & Sain w/i 20 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised to be familiar & comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/18/2011. (jct)
November 22, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney in all respects in their entirety; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Craighead County Jail, & dismissing it as a party to this action. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/22/2010. (jct)
October 21, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 22 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Craighead County Jail, directing Plaintiff to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/21/2010. (jct)
June 18, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and plaintiff's complaint on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/18/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Craighead County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cletis Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?