Ware v. Arnold et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Ware
Defendant: Paulett Arnold and Andy Allison
Case Number: 3:2010cv00070
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 31 Order, dismissing Jonathan Ware's amended complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2011. (jct)
December 27, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an updated request to proceed in forma pauperis, together with notice of his new address, within 15 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/27/2010. (jct)
July 19, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney, with one clarification about the unanswered-grievances allegations. Ware's allegations against the defendants concerning inadequate food service, too few showers while under lock down & verbal comments by a guard after an inmate hit Ware in the face are dismissed as all fail to state a claim for relief. The Court concludes that the unanswered-grievance allegations should not be dismissed because they serve a legal purpose in this case as it goes forward on the remaining allegations. Ware may proceed against the defendants on the merits of his allegations concerning an improper lock down, conviction of a disciplinary without notice & a hearing, & the improper or unlawful use of a restraint chair. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2010. (jct)
May 19, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons for defendants Paulett Arnold & Andy Allison; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the defendants with the 2 Complaint & 7 Amended Complaint without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/19/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulett Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?