McClellan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Douglas Andrew McClellan
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00084
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT 108 in favor of Douglas McClellan against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in the amount of $99,131.35; postjudgment interest will accrue at 0.12% per annum from today's date until the judgment is paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/11. (vjt)
October 12, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 State Farm's Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 38 State Farm's Second Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 42 McClellan's Motion in Limine; denying as mo ot 33 First Motion in Limine, 40 Third Motion in Limine & 48 Motion to Amend Motion in Limine filed by State Farm. The parties should file a joint status report by 10/31/11. A pre-trial conference is scheduled on 11/2/11, at 3:00 p.m., in Little Rock Courtroom B155. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2011. (jct)
October 7, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting State Farm's 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment & 37 Motion to supplement. McClellan's outrage & bad-faith claims are dismissed with prejudice. His breach-of-contract claim remains for the jury. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2011. (jct)
May 18, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 McClellan's MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. He may file a five-page sur-reply by 5/25/11. This case is now first out for a jury trial starting on 6/6/11 in Jonesboro., (Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2011 at 11:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. The Court will also hear argument on all the motions in limine at the pre-trial.) Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Andrew McClellan
Represented By: James A. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?