Hassan v. Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation

Plaintiff: Adel Hassan
Defendant: Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00100
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 35 Order entered this date granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's remaining claims, this case is DISMISSED, & judgment confirming the arbitration award is entered in favor of Defendant & against Plaintiff as follows: (1) An award in the amount of $119,745.38 for damages & interest through 5/26/10; (2) An award in the amount of $32,000.00 in attorneys' fees, $1,907.28 in costs & $1,027.62 in interest. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/8/2010. (jct)
June 7, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/7/2010. (jct)
May 13, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Plaintiff's counterclaim seeking relief under Section 1981 & the Arkansas Civil Rights Act is not arbitrable. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration on this claim is DENIED. This action is STAYED pending a decision on the other claims already in arbitration, & the parties are directed to contact the Court when arbitration has been completed. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/13/2010. (jct)
May 7, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing counsel to brief certain issues by noon, Tuesday, May 11, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/7/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Hassan
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?