Noel v. Liberty Bank of Arkansas

Plaintiff: Virginia McKee Noel
Defendant: Liberty Bank of Arkansas
Case Number: 3:2010cv00107
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 111 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/27/2012. (jak)
November 8, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's to file a response to 98 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss by noon, November 16, 2012. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/8/2012. (jak)
October 16, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/16/2012. (jak)
May 16, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Sealed Motion for contempt; denying 72 Sealed Motion for Leave to File a reply brief. Stephens Inc will provide the information requested in item No. 3 of the 6/6/2011 subpoena w/i 3 days from the entry of this Order. Failure to comply may result in sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2012. (jct)
April 3, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Stephens, Inc. to produce all of the documents that it has been ordered to produce on or before 4/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/3/2012. (jct)
December 21, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. The stay of discovery is lifted. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/21/2011. (jct)
July 25, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside 13 Final Scheduling Order & removing this case from the trial docket. The Court directs that the lawyers for Virginia McKee Noel & Liberty Bank of Arkansas consult regarding matters per this Order & submit to the Court an agree d schedule pursuant to which the discovery would be concluded & the issues briefed. All other discovery is stayed pending resolution of motion for summary judgment. All pending motions are denied as moot, without prejudice to the right of the parties to renew those motions at an appropriate time should the motion for summary judgment be denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/2011. (jct)
November 3, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action; granting 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/2010. (jct)
July 16, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel v. Liberty Bank of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McKee Noel
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Bank of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?