Whitaker v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Gerald Whitaker
Defendant: Curtis Walker, Charles Ellis and Barbara Halsey
Case Number: 3:2010cv00115
Filed: June 2, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 26 Order entered this date, this petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/13/2010. (jct)
August 10, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Respondent will have up to & including 8/23/2010 to file a response to the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/10/2010. (jct)
July 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent's response is due 8/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/2010. (jct)
June 15, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Petitioner's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; granting 7 MOTION to Amend. The Clerk is directed to file the motion to amend as a supplement to 2 Petition. The Clerk is instructed to substitute Ray Hobbs, Int erim Director of the Arkansas Department of Correction as the sole Respondent. The remaining parties Petitioner names as "defendants" are dismissed from the case as they are not proper parties to a habeas corpus action. The Clerk is instr ucted to serve 2 Petition, 7 Motion to Amend & a copy of this Order on Respondent & the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. The Court directs Respondent to file an answer, motion or responsive pleading to the Petition w/i 20 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/15/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?