Chatt et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Rosie Chatt and Dewayne Chatt, Jr
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of, Samuel Malone, Steven Jackson, Sam Futch, Derrick Thomas, Kevin Mainhart, James Brown, Juletha Hancock, Gwen Williams, Dana Dykes, Terry Butler, Thomas Parker and Louis Jamison
Case Number: 3:2010cv00119
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 99 Memorandum and Order dismissing pltfs' federal claims with prejudice. Pltfs' state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/19/11. (kpr)
June 2, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Defendants' MOTION to Continue., (Jury Trial rescheduled for week beginning 1/9/2012 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Amended Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 12/9/2011). All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/2/2011. (jct)
April 12, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Extension of Time to file responses. Plaintiffs' response deadlines to 59 , 63 & 66 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment & to 62 MOTION to Dismiss are extended to & including 5/13/11. The Court grants 56 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Dismiss Dana Dykes & Lt. Dana Dykes is dismissed as a defendant. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/12/2011. (jct)
March 22, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Issuance of an Order for the release of records. The Arkansas State Crime Lab/Arkansas State Medical Examiner is hereby ordered to allow the parties in this case access to its files regarding the incident that is the subject matter of this lawsuit, i.e. Medical Examiner File No. 391-08; Lab No. 008214. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/22/2011. (jct)
February 2, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying at this time 44 Defendants' Motion to Compel; denying at this time 46 Defendants' Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
January 12, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend And to Complete Discovery. The motion is granted to the extent that the parties have until & including 2/28/11 in which to amend the pleadings, complete discovery & file any dispositive motions. (Discovery due by 2/28/2011). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/12/2010. (jct)
September 24, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying at this time defts' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/23/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatt et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Chatt
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Chatt, Jr
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Futch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mainhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juletha Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?