Thompson v. Butterball LLC

Plaintiff: Gloria Thompson
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00127
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 89 MOTION to Withdraw it's 84 MOTION for Costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/8/2012. (jct)
January 18, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying as moot 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply; denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw & withdrawing & denying as moot 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay execution. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/18/2012. (jct)
September 27, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 26 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part 27 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 29 Motion for Sanctions. The relief granted is limited to the awarding of fees & costs in the amount of $3,500. Thompson is directed to pay the fees & costs to Butterball LLC in the amount of $3,500. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/27/2011. (jct)
May 9, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to provide the requested documents & fully respond to Butterball's interrogatories. Butterball is directed to submit a formal fee petition setting forth fees & costs i ncurred in bringing this motion. Plaintiff may respond to the motion for fees & costs w/i 14 days of the day in which Butterball submits its fee petition. Thompson is also directed to show cause why she should not be sanctioned pursuant to Rule 37(b) for failing to comply with 18 Order of 12/20/10. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/9/2011. (jct)
December 30, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for a protective order to prevent discovery of her Federal Income Tax filings. Defendant requests reimbursement from Plaintiff for attorneys' fees & costs incurred in responding to her motion for protective order. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the entry of this Order to respond to Defendant's request. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/30/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Butterball LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Thompson
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?