Rawaid et al v. S & S Oil Company Inc

Plaintiff: Mohamed Rawaid and Twalh Inc
Defendant: S & S Oil Company Inc
Counter_claimant: S & S Oil Company Inc
Counter_defendant: Mohamed Rawaid and Twalh Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00144
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 32 Stipulation. If the parties desire that any settlement agreement be made a part of the record, they are directed to reduce it to writing & file those documents w/i 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2012. (jct)
February 15, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mohamed Rawaid, Twalh Inc. The discovery deadline is extended to 8/29/11. This extension impacts the remainder of the scheduling order, & an amended scheduling order will be entered. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/15/2011. (jct)
January 27, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding "protected materials" in this cause of action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawaid et al v. S & S Oil Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Rawaid
Represented By: R. Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twalh Inc
Represented By: R. Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & S Oil Company Inc
Represented By: R. Porter Feild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: S & S Oil Company Inc
Represented By: R. Porter Feild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mohamed Rawaid
Represented By: R. Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Twalh Inc
Represented By: R. Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?