State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Shelby County Healthcare Corporation

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Shelby County Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00169
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Shelby County Health Care Corporation against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, pursuant to 69 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment entered this date. The Defendant is awarded $33,333.31 on the counterclaims against the Plaintiff. The Complaint of the Plaintiff is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/11. (jct)
December 27, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/27/2010. (jct)
August 23, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Curtis H. Goetsch on behalf of Defendant. The requirement for designation of local counsel is waived. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/23/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Shelby County Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?