Butler v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Mark A Butler
Defendant: John Smith, Jeramie Sparks, Hall, Webb, Thomas, French, Morris, Graham, Jane Doe and Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv00172
Filed: July 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 28 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/2010. (jct)
October 15, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS & it is not adopted by the Court. The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for appropriate action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/2010. (jct)
September 22, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising plaintiff that he shall have 12 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint explaining only one of his constitutional claims, naming each defendant, explaining exactly what each defendant did that violated his rights & explaining exactly how each defendant injured plaintiff. Failure to file the amended complaint as directed will result in dismissal of plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/22/2010. (jct)
August 3, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff, if he wishes to proceed with this action, to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the $350 filing fee, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Further, Plaintiff is ordered to file an Amend ed Complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order, specifically explaining only one constitutional claim so that the Court can determine whether he may proceed with this lawsuit. Failure to timely & completely respond to this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/3/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeramie Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?