Farmers Bank & Trust Company v. Ameris of Arkansas LLC et al

Plaintiff: Farmers Bank & Trust Company
Defendant: Ameris of Arkansas LLC, Ameris of Osceola LLC, First Tennessee Bank National Association and Mississippi County
Cross_claimant: Mississippi County
Cross_defendant: First Tennessee Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2010cv00173
Filed: July 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 106 Order of Dismissal, pursuant to the parties' agreement, all accrued interest remaining in the Court's registry shall be distributed to Plaintiff Mississippi County, d/b/a Mississippi County Hospital System. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/13/2011. (jct)
June 1, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 the County's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Although First Tennessee has a valid security interest in Ameris's accounts, that interest does not attach until CMS audits & finalizes payments after each fiscal year. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/2011. (jct)
October 26, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 41 Order, directing that the funds deposited by Farmers Bank & Trust Company into the registry of the Court are to be invested in an interest-bearing account. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/26/2010. (jct)
October 25, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Mississippi County Hospital System. Farmers is directed to deposit the disputed funds into the registry of the Court, & the parties are hereby realigned as follows: Plaintiffs, Ameris of A rkansas, LLC, Ameris of Osceola LLC & Mississippi County, d/b/a Mississippi County Hospital System; Defendant, First Tennessee Bank National Association. Following receipt of the disputed funds from Farmers Bank and Trust Company, that party will be discharged from any further liability regarding the funds in the '98 and '74 accounts. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/25/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Bank & Trust Company v. Ameris of Arkansas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameris of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameris of Osceola LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank National Association
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County
Represented By: William T. Marshall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Mississippi County
Represented By: William T. Marshall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: First Tennessee Bank National Association
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?