Ray et al v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Glen Ray, Marty Ray and Francisco Martinez
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation and Darrell Weiss
Case Number: 3:2010cv00185
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, pursuant to settlement, that the complaint and all claims in this action against defendant be, and they are, hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/28/2012. (jak)
April 30, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert L. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiffs, the Clerk is directed to terminate Mr. Harlan as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/30/2012. (jct)
November 7, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to the Court being informed that a new attorney will be entering an appearance for plaintiffs in the near future, this case is removed from the Court's 12/12/11 trial docket, & all deadlines are stayed pending entry of appearance by new counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/7/2011. (jct)
September 6, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the Court's 9/19/11 trial docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be established by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/6/2011. (jct)
August 29, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending pretrial deadlines pending further word from Plaintiffs' counsel regarding when he will be able to resume work. Trial is scheduled to begin on 9/19/11, & will remain on the docket for that date unless & until a continuance is requested. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/2011. (jct)
July 25, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice as to defendant Darrell Weiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/11. (hph)
June 6, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE is hereby given to the plaintiffs that the Court will dismiss this action as to defendant Darrell Weiss without prejudice unless proof of service is filed on or before 7/6/11, or the plaintffs establish good cause for the failure to serve summons & complaint on defendant Darrell Weiss w/i 120 days after the filing of the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/2011. (jct)
April 21, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 6/8/2011 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 319 of the Federal Building, 615 South Main Street, Jonesboro, Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/21/11. (srw)
April 13, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Modify Scheduling Order. The 5/2/11 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/13/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Ray
Represented By: Bruce O. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Ray
Represented By: Bruce O. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Martinez
Represented By: Bruce O. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?