Mitchell v. Postal Service (U.S.)

Plaintiff: Gerald W Mitchell
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Case Number: 3:2010cv00201
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 37 Order entered this date, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2011. (jct)
February 2, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 MOTION for Order filed by Gerald W Mitchell. The time within which the parties must file their Rule 26(f) report is extended up to & including 5/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/2/2011. (jct)
January 26, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. (Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/4/2011). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/26/2011. (jct)
November 18, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising plaintiff of his responsibility to be familiar & comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of plaintiff's claim. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?