Hardy v. Osinowo et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius Hardy
Defendant: Oluseyi T Osinowo, Armstrong Transfer & Storage Company Inc/Armstrong Relocation Company, Jackson, Mississippi and United Van Lines LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00204
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to settlement. All pending motions are moot. The 10/21/11 telephone conference & 10/24/11 jury trial are cancelled. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/2011. (jct)
October 17, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Defendants' Motion in Limine to exclude testimony relating to Defendant Osinowo not wearing shoes. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/17/2011. (jct)
October 12, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Lloyd Hoffspiegel to bring electronics into the Jonesboro Courthouse on 10/24/11 for the jury trial of this matter. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/12/2011. (jct)
October 5, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for 10/24/2011 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge James M. Moody. Motions in limine should be filed on or before 10/14/11; trial briefs & agreed jury instructions should be submitted by e-mail on or before 10/14/11. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/5/2011. (jct)
October 4, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine to use special verdict forms. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/4/2011. (jct)
September 30, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. The parties are precluded from referring at trial to the dismissal of the citation issued for careless driving arising from the accident at issue herein. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/30/2011. (jct)
July 13, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/2011. (jct)
May 17, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 joint MOTION to Continue. The Court will reschedule the case for trial the week of 10/31/11 by separate Order. In light of the new trial date, the following Motions are deemed moot: 66 , 69 , 71 , 73 , 74 & 76 . The Cour t denies without prejudice the following motions in limine: 37 & 43 . Although labeled as a motion in limine, the Court will treat 64 MOTION in Limine to Declare A Portion of Act 649 of 2003 Unconstitutional as substantive motion. Defendant is directed to respond to the motion w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/17/2011. (jct)
March 7, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel discovery arising from Defendant Osinowo's failure to appear for his deposition. Defendant Osinowo is directed to appear for his deposition at the date & time set by the parties. Plaintiff's request for the imposition of sanctions & costs is denied at this time. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/7/2011. (jct)
August 30, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion for admission pro hac vice by Lloyd Hoffspeigel. Counsel is directed to file his motion pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/30/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Osinowo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Hardy
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oluseyi T Osinowo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Transfer & Storage Company Inc/Armstrong Relocation Company, Jackson, Mississippi
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines LLC
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?