Brewer v. McCann et al

Plaintiff: Nicklelas Necessity Brewer
Defendant: Jack McCann, John Smith, Rick Webb, Jeremy Sparks and Debra McMullin
Case Number: 3:2010cv00245
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion for Costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to distribute to G. Gregory Niblock of the law firm of Niblock & Bueker, the amount of $429.25 from the reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses fund. A copy of this order, along with the application for reimbursement, shall be placed in the fund and maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/20/2012. (jak)
June 25, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL denying oral motion of Plaintiff's counsel for a continuance of the jury trial scheduled to commence 6/25/2012. The Defendant's oral motion to dismiss this action against Defendant, Rick Webb, was granted for the reasons stated on the record & over the objections of Plaintiff's counsel. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral motion to be relieved made by Plaintiff's counsel, G. Gregory Niblock & Ronald C. Hunt, is granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/25/2012. (jct)
June 21, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to jury trial scheduled in this matter on 6/25/2012, before U.S. District Judge Susan Webber Wright, in Courtroom #1D, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR, the Central Office of the Arkans as Department of Correction is directed to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Nicklelas Necessity Brewer, ADC #116152, who is presently confined in the Arkansas Department of Correction, Wrightsville. The jury trial is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on that date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/21/2012. (jct)
January 5, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for 6/25/2012 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1D before Judge Susan Webber Wright. The deadlines for discovery & motions have expired. All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/2012. (jct)
June 28, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge H. David Young in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed to jury trial on his claims of excessive force against De fendant Rick Webb, & denial of adequate medical care against Defendants John Smith, Jeremy Sparks & Debra McMullin. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Jack McCann are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to introduce sufficient evidence to create a fact issue to be submitted to a jury, & McCann's name is removed as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/2011. (jct)
May 9, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all of pltf's proposed witnesses are denied 20 ; the ADC is directed to ensure pltf's attendance, along with his institutional and medical records, at the evidentiary hearing scheduled for 5/23/11 at 1:00 p.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/9/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. McCann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicklelas Necessity Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra McMullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?