Biggins v. Anco Construction Inc et al

Plaintiff: Charlie Biggins
Defendant: Anco Construction Inc and United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00257
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2017. (jak)
January 21, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Hammet to provide the Court, by 23 January 2015, with a current mailing address for Anco Construction, Inc., and United Fire & Casualty Company by filing a notice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Lift Stay. For good cause shown, the Court also grants Lawrence B. Hammett II's motion for withdrawal. He is no longer associated with this case. The Court stays, and administratively terminates, the case again. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/2015. (jak)
July 17, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Lift the Stay. The Court also grants Cyril Hollingsworth's motion for withdrawal. He is no longer associated with this case. The Court stays, and administratively terminates, the case again. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/17/2014. (jak)
November 14, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Telephone Conference, the mediation scheduled for November 15, 2013, has been cancelled. The case remains stayed and administratively terminated. If no party requests relief by 27 June 2014, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. In the meantime, any party may seek any appropriate relief by moving to lift the stay and asking for court action. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2013. (jak)
December 7, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties of this case to either mediate or arbitrate this dispute. Plaintiff has until 1/10/2013 to give notice to Defendant Anco as to whether or not this case intends to return to mediation. If the dispute is not resolved in med iation or otherwise by settlement, then the Court compels arbitration. The case is stayed and administratively terminated. Status report due on 31 May 2013 and every six months thereafter until the parties' dispute is resolved. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2012. (jak)
October 27, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the stay in this case until January 6, 2012. If the Court receives no request for action by that date, it will administratively terminate the case. The briefing on the arbitration issue & the status conference are cancelled. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to Biggins's bankruptcy attorney, & the Trustee of his bankruptcy estate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggins v. Anco Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Biggins
Represented By: James D. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Cyril Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?