Alley v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Andrea Alley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv00265
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving fees and costs in the amount of $3,991.27; finding the EAJA fee award is payable to Plaintiff and mailed to Plaintiff's counsel, but subject to any offset to satisfy any pre-existing debt owed to the U.S.; and directing Defendant to certify said award and pay Plaintiff's attorney this amount. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/18/2012. (srw)
February 23, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 22 Memorandum and Order filed in this matter this date, the decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded for action consistent with the opinion of the case. This is a "Sentence Four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/23/2012. (srw)
May 5, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, if either party believes oral argument would be helpful to the Court in deciding this matter, counsel is hereby invited to advise the Court w/i 15 days of the entry of this Order to schedule oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/4/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Alley
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?