Peoples v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Loretta Peoples
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv00268
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 22 Motion for Attorney's Fees under the EAJA; pltf is awarded $3,701.67 in fees and expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/18/12. (vjt)
October 31, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Loretta Peoples pursuant to 20 Order entered this date. The Commissioner's decision is reversed & this case is remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/31/2011. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
May 12, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott T. Morris is hereby relieved as counsel. Martin W. Long has entered his appearance as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/12/2011. (jct)
March 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time filed by Loretta Peoples., (Plaintiff Brief's due by 4/4/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/8/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Peoples
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?