Jackson v. Selig

Plaintiff: Richard F Jackson
Defendant: John M Selig
Case Number: 3:2010cv00276
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with 49 Order, Judgment is hereby entered granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 40 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment claims with prejudice. Accordingly, ADHS is permanently enjoined from assessing a penalty against Mr. Jackson for the purchase of the annuities, and from considering the annuities or their payments as income or resources available to Mr. Jackson in determining his eligibility for Medicaid Benefits. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/09/2013. (jak)
April 18, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER directing counsel to respond by 5:00 p.m. Thursday, April 25, 2013, to Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/18/2013. (jak)
March 13, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 40 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, ADHS is permanently enjoined from assessing a penalty against Mr. Jackson for the purchase of the annuities, and from considering the annuities or their payments as income or resources available to Mr. Jackson in determining his eligibility for Medicaid Benefits. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/13/2013. (jak)
August 24, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Lift Stay. The stay in this case is lifted, and a scheduling order will issue shortly. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/24/2012. (jak)
February 28, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER, amending 18 Order, GRANTING 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; DENYING 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant, in his official capaci ty as Director of the Arkansas Department of Human Services, is PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from (1) considering the income stream payable to Ms. Alva Jackson, from two federally compliant annunities, in determining Plaintiff's Medicaid eligibility, & (2) from denying Medicaid coverage to Plaintiff. This injunction shall be effective as of the first day of the third month before the month of this Order & will remain in force until this case has been fully & finally adjudicated on the merits. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/28/2011. (jct)
February 18, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO & Preliminary Injunction; denying Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is directed to submit a precedent for Preliminary Injunction by 5 p.m. on 2/22/11. Defendant may offer objections to the precedent by 5 p.m. on 2/24/11. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/18/2011. (jct)
December 22, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/22/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F Jackson
Represented By: Chad R. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?