Griffin v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Douglas H Griffin
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv00295
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Social Security Administration pursuant to 16 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/12/2011. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ)
May 16, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 5/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/16/11. (vjt)
March 21, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 10 Scheduling Order entered 3/21/11. The parties should proceed under 8 Scheduling Order dated 3/16/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/21/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H Griffin
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?