Thrasher v. Bryan et al
Plaintiff: |
Dennis Thrasher |
Defendant: |
Michael Bryan, Johnson and Ronald Beck |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00298 |
Filed: |
November 23, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Beth Deere |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Leon Holmes |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 20, 2012 |
Filing
56
JUDGMENT consistent with 55 Order. It is hereby considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/20/2012. (jak)
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER appointing Attorney Matthew C. Hutsell to represent Defendant Michael Bryan in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Hutsell & Mr. Bryan a copy of this Order. Counsel may access the file from CM/ECF. Counsel must make written application to withdraw within 21 days of the date of this Order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/12/2012. (jct)
|
April 10, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER, in conformity with Rule 83.7 of the Local Rules, Attorney Kathryn A. Pryor is hereby appointed to represent Plaintiff Dennis Thrasher in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is directed to send Ms. Pryor a copy of this Order & Loca l Rule 83.7, & send a copy of this Order to Mr. Thrasher. Counsel must make written application to withdraw within 21 days of the date of this Order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/10/2012. (jct)
|
December 21, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER denying 38 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/27/2011. (jct)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER directing Mr. Thrasher to inform the Court, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, of his new address. He is also ordered to submit a new request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the remaining filing fee to the Court. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/11/2011. (jct)
|
February 17, 2011 |
Filing
16
ORDER directing the Clerk to reissue summons for Defendant Bryan, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copy of the Complaint 2 & summons upon Defendant Bryan at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees & costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/17/2011. (jct)
|
December 30, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER ADOPTING 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in its entirety. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Johnson & Beck are DISMISSED without prejudice. In addition, Plaintiff's claim for money damages against Defendant Bryan in his official capacity is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/30/2010. (jct)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?