Fulks v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Plaintiff: Evangelina Fulks
Defendant: CSX Corporation and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00310
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT Pursuant to Rule 54(b), per 38 Order entered 11/9/11 in favor of Union Pacific Railroad Company on the claims of Evangeline Fulks, Administratrix of the Estate of Julia Fulks, ruilng that Fulks' claims that different or addition al warning devices should have been installed at the crossing in question are preempted by federal law & dismissing those claims with prejudice. Pursuant to 47 Order of Dismissal entered this date, the remainder of this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/2011. (jct)
November 9, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 22 Union Pacific's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Fulks' claims that different or additional warning devices should have been installed at the crossing in question are preempted by federal law and are dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/9/2011. (jct)
March 31, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, by agreement of the parties, separate defendant CSX Transportation Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice from this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/31/2011. (jct)
January 28, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 12 Answer to Complaint, directing the Clerk to correct the style of the case to show that CSX Transportation, Inc. is the correct party defendant, replacing CSX Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulks v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangelina Fulks
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: P. Mark Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?