Whitlock v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Plaintiff: William Earl Whitlock
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Cross_defendant: Mary Jane Whitlock and William Rufus Whitlock
Cross_claimant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Counter_claimant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Counter_defendant: William Earl Whitlock
Case Number: 3:2010cv00316
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of William Earl Whitlock against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. It is therefore considered, ordered and adjudged that William Earl Whitlock, have and recover of and from defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company the sum of $68,375.00, together with interest from this date until paid at the rate of 0.11% per annum as provided by law. Defendant's claims against the Whitlocks are dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/13/2013. (jak)
April 11, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The trial in this matter will commence at 9:30 AM on the previously scheduled date of May 6, 2013 in Jonesboro, Arkansas. Counsel should be present at 9:00 AM for pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/11/2013. (jak)
October 12, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for week beginning 10/9/2012 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 9/10/2012; all deadlines for discovery & motions have expired. All other deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/12/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Earl Whitlock
Represented By: Curtis L. Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mary Jane Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: William Rufus Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William Earl Whitlock
Represented By: Curtis L. Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?