McCullough v. Hudson et al

Plaintiff: Walter A McCullough
Defendant: Ann Hudson, Carolyn York, Mary Ann Wilkinson and Moses Jackson
Case Number: 3:2010cv00330
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 7 Order & 8 Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2011. (jct)
March 14, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 7 Order entered this date, Walter McCullough's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the related Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2011. (jct)
January 11, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order to clarify the stated points. If Plaintiff fails to timely & properly file the Amended Complaint, then this case may be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter A McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?