Daniels v. Byrd

Plaintiff: Tony Daniels
Defendant: Charley Elmer Byrd
Case Number: 3:2011cv00018
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 27 Order entered this date, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/2012. (jct)
August 2, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint on or before 8/15/11, stating the constitutional right which he feels was violated by the collision with the Defendant's police car. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/2/2011. (jct)
April 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 14 Answer to Complaint, directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate the correct name of the defendant as Charley Elmer Byrd. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/4/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charley Elmer Byrd
Represented By: Richard A. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?