Saleh et al v. Department of Agriculture

Plaintiff: Derhim Saleh and Wisam Anaam
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 3:2011cv00033
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Food & Drug
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 20 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this action is hereby DISMISSED, IN ITS ENTIRETY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/2011. (jct)
September 20, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Department of Agriculture, finding that the Clerk of the Court should consider the motion for a clerk's entry of default. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/20/2011. (jct)
September 9, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising the Court will instruct the Clerk of the Court to terminate Danny's Grocery as a separate counter defendant & list the counter defendants as Derhim Saleh, doing business as Danny's Grocery, & Wisam Anaam, doing business as Danny's Grocery. The parties have 5 days from the entry date of this Order in which to file objections to the proposed corrections. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/9/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh et al v. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derhim Saleh
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisam Anaam
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?