Perry et al v. Stevens Transport Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Perry and Sheila Perry
Defendant: Stevens Transport Inc and Richard Kirsche
Movant: Louisiana Commerce & Trade Association
Case Number: 3:2011cv00048
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 121 Notice of Settlement, this action is hereby removed from the trial docket for the week of February 25, 2013. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate this action administratively. The Court further directs the parties to not ify the Court upon Medicare's acceptance of the proposed Medicare set aside. If Medicare refuses to accept the Medicare set aside, any party may move to reopen this action within 30 days after receipt of notice that Medicare has refused to accept the set aside. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/20/2012. (jak)
August 15, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Joint MOTION to Continue the trial date in this matter. The trial of this matter previously set for September 17, 2012, in Jonesboro, Arkansas, is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/15/2012. (jak)
July 9, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Kirschke & Stevens Transport Inc. Plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages against both Kirschke & Stevens Transport are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs� 39; various negligence claims against Stevens Transport for direct liability are also DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket to identify the Defendant as Richard Kirschke, not Kirsche. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/2012. (jct)
June 29, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Joint MOTION to Extend Motions Deadline; Motions due by 7/27/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/29/12. (vjt)
April 20, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltfs' 45 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/12. (vjt)
November 22, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Defendants' MOTION to Continue. The 4/30/2012 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/22/2011. (jct)
October 19, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Joint MOTION to Continue. The 2/27/12 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/2011. (jct)
May 31, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Intervene filed by Louisiana Commerce & Trade Association. The Complaint in Intervention must be filed w/i 7 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/31/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Stevens Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Perry
Represented By: Earl Ross Downs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Perry
Represented By: Earl Ross Downs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport Inc
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kirsche
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Louisiana Commerce & Trade Association
Represented By: William C. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?